Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fia Card Services, Na, F K A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Espinosa, Claudine, against Rodriguez, Ramon, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): RAMON RODRIGUEZ SERVED: 12/18/2007 FILED: 12/20/2007 Issue Date: 12/10/2007 File Date: 12/20/2007 Service Date: 12/18/2007 |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): RAMON RODRIGUEZ SERVED: 12/18/2007 FILED: 12/20/2007 Issue Date: 12/10/2007 File Date: 12/20/2007 Service Date: 12/18/2007 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ SVC/JM |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.