Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Jorge, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Hunnicutt, Richard W., Iii, against Transportation Insurance Company, Cna Insurance Company, Ltd, Cna Financial Corporation, Cna Insurance & Financial Group, Inc, represented by Williams, Jeremy A, Fields, Ken, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting DWOP Hearing: 05/11/18 @ 9am |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
June 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
May 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.