Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abernethy, William A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rodney, Melody C, against Lopez, Saida, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSaldana, Marisela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2005 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT/GG |
|
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T DISMISS /GG |
|
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): SAIDA LOPEZ SERVED: Issue Date: 09/19/2005 | |
September 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): SAIDA LOPEZ SERVED: Issue Date: 09/19/2005 |
|
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/CP |
|
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET FAXED |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LETTER WITH SVC INSTRUCTIONS/CP |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.