Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1901 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN BILL O COST/GG |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT/GG |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
June 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICEMEMBER'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT AFFIDAVIT/JE |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NO SVC REQ'D AT THIS TIME /AS |
|
January 01, 1901 | Docket Event |
01/01/1901 Case Event Conv CASE BALANCE UPDATED BY BOOKKEEPING 07/18/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.