Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
John G & Marie Stella Kenedy Mem Found, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ratliff, Shannon H., against Tri-C Resources, Inc, represented by Garber, Kathering T, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
March 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JOINT MTN F DISMISS W/PREJUDICE /GG |
|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: TRI-C RESOURCES, INC. |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): TRI-C RESOURCES, INC. SERVED: 01/03/2005 FILED: 01/18/2005 Served By: TEXAS CIVIL PROCESS INC CP21 Issue Date: 12/30/2004 File Date: 01/18/2005 Service Date: 01/03/2005 |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ NO SVC/JM |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): TRI-C RESOURCES, INC. SERVED: 01/03/2005 FILED: 01/18/2005 Served By: TEXAS CIVIL PROCESS INC CP21 Issue Date: 12/30/2004 File Date: 01/18/2005 Service Date: 01/03/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.