Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Homecomings Financial Network, Inc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Varner, Dominique M., against Escarzaga, Griselda, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vela, Rose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVela, Rose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DWOP NOTICES MAILED |
|
May 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O HRG /GG |
|
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT SERVICEMEMBER AFDVIT/GG |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O GRISELDA ESCARZAGA |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIV CASE INFO SHT/GG |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING NO SERVICE/JAU |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET MAILED TO ATTORNEY/JAU |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.