Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Vargas, Nicholas, represented by Starcher, Charles Cecil, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales Ramos, Nelva Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: NICHOLAS VARGAS |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): NICHOLAS VARGAS SERVED: 06/06/2005 FILED: 06/06/2005 Served By: LARRY OLIVAREZ, SR. NCS Issue Date: 05/27/2005 File Date: 06/06/2005 Service Date: 06/06/2005 | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): NICHOLAS VARGAS SERVED: 06/06/2005 FILED: 06/06/2005 Served By: LARRY OLIVAREZ, SR. NCS Issue Date: 05/27/2005 File Date: 06/06/2005 Service Date: 06/06/2005 |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (CN1): NICHOLAS VARGAS SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 01/04/2005 Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 12/28/2004 File Date: 01/04/2005 | |
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (CN1): NICHOLAS VARGAS SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 01/04/2005 Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 12/28/2004 File Date: 01/04/2005 |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ NO SVC/JM |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.