Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NO SERVICE SHEET/DCB |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv WAIVER OF SERVICE/DCB |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAMILY LAW INFO/DCB |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
January 01, 1900 | Docket Event |
01/01/1900 Case Event Conv 2278 FORMS ( 1 CHILD) Service Date: 06/01/2005 |
|
January 01, 1900 | Docket Event |
01/01/1900 Case Event Conv REPORT OF DIVORCE Service Date: 06/01/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.