Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Childress, Wendi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lucas, James E, against Dimas, Mary Bosman, represented by Martinez, Patrick M., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FOREMAN WILSON /GG |
|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O APPEAR O GUARDIAN AD LITEM F MINOR PLT COURTNEY |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MOT F APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
July 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F APPOINTMNT O GUARDIAN AD LITEM /GG |
|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORD DISMISSAL/WENDY CHILDRESS ONLY |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATION O EXPERT WITNESSES/CC |
|
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F VAC/GG |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTIFICATE O DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS (LETTER) |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MARILYN JOHNSON/LEGAL SECETARY II/CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.