Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wieboldt, Polly S., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Wieboldt, Werner A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Motion to Deny Relief and/or Motion to Dismiss Relief Requested in Motion for Enforcement or Child Support--Granted; It is Further Ordered that the Motion to Show Cause and Enforce is Denied (signed) | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing (OCA) M2 DISMISS VIA ZOOM ID# 91222452635 |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) M2 DISMISS |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) M2 DENY RELIEF |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Deny Relief and/or Motion to Dismiss Relief Requested in Motion for Enforcement of Child Support | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order on Motion to Deny Relief and/or Motion to Dismiss Relief Requsted in Motion for Enforcement of Child Support |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Answer to Motion for Enforcement of Child Support Order |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation- Werner A Wieboldt |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Mailed to Heath Lauseng, Attorney at Law, 919 State Highway 361, #201, Port Aransas TX 78373 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.