Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Labor Ready, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Warren, John S, against Shipley Donuts, Holt, Lisa, Jasek, A K A, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlager, James E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2001 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
August 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SHOW CAUSE (R): LISA JASEK, A/K/A SERVED: 08/19/2002 FILED: 08/19/2002 Served By: PEREZ, JOE R. CP43 Issue Date: 08/12/2002 File Date: 08/19/2002 Service Date: 08/19/2002 |
|
August 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Citation SHOW CAUSE (R): LISA JASEK, A/K/A SERVED: 08/19/2002 FILED: 08/19/2002 Served By: PEREZ, JOE R. CP43 Issue Date: 08/12/2002 File Date: 08/19/2002 Service Date: 08/19/2002 |
|
August 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
August 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION IN CONTEMPT: LABOR READY, INC. Issue Date: 08/07/2002 |
|
August 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER STTNG MTN FOR CONTEMPT 60/533 |
|
June 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER COMPELLING ANSWER T PLT'S INTERROGATORIES 58/466-467 WRONG VOLUME |
|
May 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLNT MNT TO COMPEL ANSWER TO INTERRO WLKED BY ATT/GN |
|
April 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: LABOR READY, INC. Issue Date: 04/17/2002 |
|
March 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET F SVC REQ (AJ)/AG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.