Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Ruben, Sanchez, Jose, Rodriguez, Ray, Ramirez, Juan, Oliva, Jesse, (total of 20) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Roque, Gerald E., against Hanson Aggregates West, Inc, Hensen North America, Gifford-Hill & Co, Dalloz Safety, Inc, Wilson Safetry Products, (total of 79) See All represented by Green, Charles A, Manning, Jack B., Grimaldo, Arthur, Ii, Brill, David, Urquhart, Jack E., (total of 36) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFTS' NOTICE O NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE/CC |
|
March 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
December 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ATTY CORRES/GG |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TO DISMISS ALL CROSS CLAIMS (I) |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) INC. SURVIVAIR A DIVISION OF U.S.D. CORP. UNOPPOSED MTN |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC. SANSTORM INC. BOWEN TOOLS |
|
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BIG THREE INDUST INC ET,AL UNOPPOSED MTN T DISMISS ALL X-CLAIMS |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AFFILIATES (I) |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OF U.S.D. CORP. THEIR PARENTS SUCCESSORS, ASSIGNS AND |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) INC. SANSTORM INC. BOWEN TOOLS INC. SURVIVAIR A DIVISION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.