Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brooks, Sheri M, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Quintanilla, Gabriel R, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Huerta, Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuerta, Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Child Support Lien (AG) | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From Clerk Judgment Notice |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) I/Child Support Review Order (Confirmation of Arrears and Modification) |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Family Case Information Sheet | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Health Insurance Availability Form (AG) | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding Tmobile Usa Inc |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding Newell Auto Group |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 06/25/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.