Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Solis, Onofre Trevino, Schmidt, Cecil R, Price, Robert W, Martinez, Carlos, Sr., Hackler, Jim D, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Parron, David D., against Daimlerchrysler Corporation, Burns International Services Corp F K A, Pneumo Abex Corp, Moog Automotive, Inc, Maremont Corp, (total of 62) See All represented by Morales, Carlos, Baker, Kenneth C., Thompson, James M, Wright, Dawn M, Grimaldo, Arthur, Ii, (total of 30) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER OF DIMSISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (JOHN BENICK VS |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC) I' |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PROCEEDINGS/CC |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE O SUGGESTION O PENDENCY O BANKRUPTCY O AUTOMATIC STAY O |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) HACKLER AND CARLOS MARTINEZ VS HENRY VOGT MACHINE COMP) I |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL (LEE NOBLE; JOHN BENICK; JOHN FLYNN; JIM |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE/SH |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR NON SUIT/SH |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CORPORATION, ONLY/CC |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE O NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE AS T DEFENDANT, SEPCO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.