Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmoth, Robert, Sr., Trevino, Gabriel S, Tagle, Fernando Soliz, Rivera, Jesus G, Rios, Jose Raul, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Parron, David D., against Guard-Line, Inc, General Electric Co, American Optical Co, Viacom, Inc, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, (total of 50) See All represented by Atkinson, Darryl E, Hendryx, Michael, Oliver, David A, Hamilton, Paul E, Steele, Kyle C, (total of 24) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Huerta, Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuerta, Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Copy Order of Dismissal Under Section 90.010(d-1),TEX.CIV.PRAC.&REM.CODE//kenneth Helms Jr. |
|
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD. NON-SUIT FROM J. CAMBPELL, ETAL TO AQUA-CHEM (S) |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION /GG |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT MTN F NON SUIT W/OUT PREJUDICE T DFT AQUA CHEM INC DBA |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE O TRANSFER UNDER SECTION 90.010)B) |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE O TRANSFER UNDER SECTION 90.010(B)/CC |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F SUBS O CNSL F DFT GARLOCK SEALING TECH LLC /GG |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv GARLOCK DESIGN O ATTY I CHRG /GG |
|
March 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER NON-SUIT PL. RIVERA TO RILEY STOKER (S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.