Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Herschap, David Leslie, Herschap, Estate Of, Tracy L, Herschap, David W, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Robins, Bill, Iii, against Coastal Cardiology Assn, Garcia, Joseph, Md, Texas Arrhythmia Institute, Houston Cardiac Electrophysiology Asso, Hcea, Pa, D B A, (total of 6) See All represented by Anthony, Brett, Abernethy, William A, Uzick, Jeffrey H., Klein, David J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR WILLIAM A ABERNETHY |
|
September 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 129 O TX RULE CIV PROCEDURE |
|
April 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EXHIBITS FILE (ALL ON 6TH FLOOR TAKEN TO MICHAEL) |
|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - JURY CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F JGMT/DM |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTE FROM JUROR |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CHARGE OF THE COURT FILED |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY LIST AND JURY CHOSEN FILED |
|
January 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT JOSEPH GARCIA MD 3RD AMD TRIAL WTIS LIST/GG |
|
January 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT JOSEPH GARCIA MD 1ST AMD MTN I LIMINE/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.