Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Minnesota Mining & Mfg Co, Saenz, Jose Angel, Rowe, Dempsey, Perea, Gilberto, Olguin, Juan Mata, (total of 11) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Pletcher, Anthony E, Parron, David D., against Burns International Services Corp F K A, Pneumo Abex Corp, Moog Automotive, Inc, Maremont Corp, Honeywell International, Inc, (total of 53) See All represented by Baker, Kenneth C., Thompson, James M, Wright, Dawn M, Grimaldo, Arthur, Ii, Thackston, Robert E., (total of 26) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2001 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F NON SUIT/GG |
|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC/GG |
|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NONSUIT W/PREJUDICE T DFT SEPCO CORP ONLY/GG |
|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NTC OF NON-SUIT W/ PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT SEPCO CORP ONLY (I) . |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT NOTC O NONSUIT/GG |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NKA 3M CO. (I) |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF NONSUIT AS TO DEFT MINNESOTA MINING & |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MANUFACTURING CO NKA 3M CO. (I) |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MORGAN AGAINST DEFT MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.