Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/RELEASE OF C/S LIEN |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION/GC |
|
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Event to Reopen Case | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: HENRY N RAMIREZ |
|
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RESPOD ORIG ANS: HENRY NICK RAMIREZ |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TRCP 106 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE (I) |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv TRCP 106 MTN FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE/GC |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): HENRY NICK RAMIREZ SERVED: 04/15/2008 FILED: 04/16/2008 Issue Date: 03/19/2008 File Date: 04/16/2008 Service Date: 04/15/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.