Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morales, Mirna Pereida, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Pereida, Andy, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Banales, J. Manuel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBanales, J. Manuel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order of Withholding - Request 4/28/2015 Mailed Order on Mediated Settlement Agreement, Including order on Modification in Suit Affecting P/C/R, signed 8/24/2005 to Met Life, P. O. Box 14710, Lexington Kentucky 40513-4710//Structure Settlement ID# N525420AJR |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Place of Payment (AG) | |
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DISBURSEMENT ORDER COPY: ANDY PEREIDA Issue Date: 03/29/2006 |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER APPROVING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS INTO REG OF CT-SCANNED |
|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN TO ENTER ORDER FOR DEPOSIT OF FUNDS INTO REGISTRY OF COURT |
|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv & FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS/SH |
|
October 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE O HEARING/CC |
|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv & ATTYS' FEES |
|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv T DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE REGISTRY O THE CRT & F DISCHARGE |
|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN O METROPOLITAN LIFE INS CO & METROPOLITAN REINSURANCE CO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.