Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces, County Of, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger, Goggan, Blair &Amp; Sampson, Llp, against Bnk Of Cc, The, Davis, Charles Allen, Davis, Donell Alvin, Davis, Leola, Davis, Mary Ann, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Blackmon, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlackmon, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2001 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
March 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE OF NON-SUIT /AS |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv (COPY)LTR FRM ELVA GALVAN T MARYA DAVIS REG TXS&CRT COST |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv (COPY) LTR FRM ELVA GALVAN T ALICIA MOORE/CC - . |
|
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM (ALICIA MOORE) (IMAGED) |
|
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIT BY POST-CRTHSE (NCS): MARY ANN DAVIS SERVED: 12/15/2004 FILED: 01/28/2005 Served By: LARRY OLIVAREZ, SR. NCS Issue Date: 12/14/2004 File Date: 01/28/2005 Service Date: 12/15/2004 |
|
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIT BY POST AFDVT /AS |
|
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation CIT BY POST-CRTHSE (NCS): MARY ANN DAVIS SERVED: 12/15/2004 FILED: 01/28/2005 Served By: LARRY OLIVAREZ, SR. NCS Issue Date: 12/14/2004 File Date: 01/28/2005 Service Date: 12/15/2004 |
|
December 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTS MTN TO APPT ATTY AD LITEM /AS |
|
July 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RE: TAXES AND CRT CST /AS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.