Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces, County Of, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger, Goggan, Blair &Amp; Sampson, Llp, against Perez, Martin, Jr., Vanderbilt Mortg & Fnc, Inc, Vanderbilt Mtg & Finance, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2001 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM LINEBARGER RE: TAX COLLECTION SUIT BEING DISM AS A - . |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RESULT OF BNCY CAUSE 02-21618-C-13 DISCHARGE - . |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR NON-SUIT |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM LINEBARGER RE: REQ TO RTN TAX SUIT TO PEND DOCKET - . |
|
June 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORDER TO TRANSFER (TO SUSPENSE DOCKET) VOL 365 P 141 |
|
June 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF TRANSFER TO SUSPENSE DOCKET 365/14 |
|
June 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC OF BNCY CHPTR 13 ON CASE #0221618-C-13 /AS |
|
August 06, 2002 | Docket Event | CITATION (R): VANDERBILT MTG. & FINANCE, INC. SERVED: 09/03/2002 FILED: 09/17/2002 Served By: DALLAS COUNTY OCS Issue Date: 08/06/2002 File Date: 09/17/2002 Service Date: 09/03/2002 | |
August 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): VANDERBILT MTG. & FINANCE, INC. SERVED: 09/03/2002 FILED: 09/17/2002 Served By: DALLAS COUNTY OCS Issue Date: 08/06/2002 File Date: 09/17/2002 Service Date: 09/03/2002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.