Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lawrence, Helen Marie filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Blackmon, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlackmon, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding Legacy Home Health Agency Inc |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CPY O FEE APP F CRT APPT ATTY |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JDGMNT NTC/AG CASE CLOSED |
|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/HEALTH INS AVAIL FORM-NCP |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv STATE XBT-1 |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/HEALTH INS AVAIL FORM-CP |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR IV-D CRT RE CRT HRG |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CPY O FEE APP F CRT APPT ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.