Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Syma, Sean Anthony, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Gould, Keith, Yaffe, Alan L, against Irwin, Melanie Lynn, Syma, Melanie Lynn, represented by Stone, Nina C., Koch, Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Order for Non-Suit/I | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit **e-filed** |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify-Custody (OCA) Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Filing Instructions |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Waiver of service/E-filed | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify-Other (OCA) Petition to Modify Parent-child Relationship **e-filed** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.