Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valero, Misty, Gonzalez, Betty Jo, Campos, Luzelma, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bright, David, against Hayes, Cordell Felix, Allen, Anthony Dwain, Nueces County Community Supervision, Nueces County Adult Probation Dept, Hayes, Corporal, Cordell, (total of 10) See All represented by Brezik, Patrick, Attorney General, Texas, Bryan, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2000 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mandate ltr f supreme court o texas:judmt should be reversed. coa jugmts is reversed. judgmt is rendered dismissing the cause of want of jurisdiction. |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter frm supreme court of texas: the court of appeals judgment is reversed; rendered dismissing the cause for want of jurisdiction |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Official Notice f Supreme Court of Texas: a petition f review was fild today. respondent may file either a response or a waiver of response. if you file a waiver, crt will not grant the petition w/out first requesting a response/tgarza |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Letter from COA:judgmt o trial crt affirmed in part and reversed and rendered in pary by crt. copies o memo opin & judgmt encld/tgarza |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.