Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Angelina Marie, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Pena, Mel M, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Villarreal, Joaquin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVillarreal, Joaquin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding Ibanez Internal Medicine |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 07/12/2010 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 07/08/2010 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/NTC OF ADMIN-SOCIAL SECURITY BENEFITS GARNI |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 03/13/2009 |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 01/09/2009 |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/NTC OF ADMIN-GASTROENTEROLOGY CLINIC OF SAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.