Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Villarreal, Joaquin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVillarreal, Joaquin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding Zachry Industrial, Inc. |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 04/23/2010 |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/REL O C/S LIEN |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 08/03/2009 |
|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 04/27/2009 |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 11/30/2007 |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG CASE CLOSED |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.