Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perales, Betty Marie, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Hernandez, Antonio Soto, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z - Copy of Fee App. for Crt Appt. Atty Michael J Ryan 1/3 |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) I/Commitment Order 180 Days// $5123.77+150.00 Atty Fees+Court Costs |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z - Exhibit State Exhibit 1 |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Copy of Fee App. for Crt Appt. Atty Michael J. Ryan 10/04 |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Exhibit State Exhibit 1 |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From Clerk Judgment Notice/AG Case Closed |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Copy of Fee App. for Crt Appt. Atty | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) I/Order Enforcing Child Support & Medical Support Obligation & Modifying Support |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Health Insurance Availability Form (AG) | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z - Exhibit State Exhibit 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.