Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bellis, Raymond J, Jr., Cabler, Sharon T, Clayton, Alva J, Clayton, Barbara, Davis, Betty, (total of 23) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Cloud, Ian P., against 3M, Able Supply Co, Ac & S, Inc, Alcoa, Inc, Alden, Glen, Corp, (total of 124) See All represented by Adams, Robert Larry, Bailey, Mel D, Bean, Frank M., Berlanga, Jose A., Bissell, John G, (total of 52) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2000 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Vacation Schedule | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Vacation Schedule | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM BARBARA J BARRON RE; VACATION |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR RM BARBARA J BARRON RE; VACATION |
|
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O NONSUIT W/PREJUDICE /GG |
|
August 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST DUPONT I |
|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM BARBARA J BARRON RE; VACATION |
|
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGNST DUPONT (IMAGED) |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REMOVED FR SUSPENSE AS PER JUDGE'S ORDER |
|
October 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED JOINT MTN T DISMISS /GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.