Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brandt, Jennifer, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brent S. Phelps, Michael A. Rodriguez, against Pacific & Metcalf, L.L.C., Pacific Yard House, L.L.C., represented by Andrew J Mccluggage, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Vincenzo J. Santini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincenzo J. Santini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Jury Trial
Date: April 15, 2024Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 20, 2023Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) 07/17/2023Reset by Court to 04/15/2024 |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 203 Certification of Written Deposition- Jennifer Salas Certificate of Deposition |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certification Rule 203 Filing - Glynis Holley Certificate of Deposition |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Designation of Lead Counsel and Attorney in Charge Notice of Representation |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (4/15/24) Docket Control Order |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance (Signed) Order for Continuance |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order Proposed Order |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Brent S. Phelps Affidavit |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion for Continuance Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.