Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Autotainment Partners Limited Partnership D B A Planet Ford, filed a(n) Other Civil - Under $250,000 case represented by Jeremy M. Jones, against Childers, Matthew, Demontigny, Katie, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil - Under $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Abstract of Judgment
Date: April 06, 2023Writ of Execution
Date: August 03, 2023Request For Service
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Execution Writ of Execution |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Post Judgment - Writ of ExecutionChilders, Matthew Unserved Demontigny, Katie Unserved | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Execution Request For Service |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment for Katie Demontigny Abstract of Judgment |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment for Katie Demontigny Request For Service |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Order Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT Final Order After Non-Jury Trial |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Default Judgment Proposed Order |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.