Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Whitney Abbott, against Pope, Randy C, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial Debt - Under $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Default Judgment
Date: December 30, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 30, 2022Proposed Order
Date: October 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Motion (No Fee) |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation - Randy C Pope Return of Service |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Substitute Service Signed Order |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Rule 106 Motion for Substituted Service of Process Proposed Order |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, NA's Rule 106 Motion for Order Granting Substituted Service Motion (No Fee) |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationPope, Randy CServed11/12/2022Returned11/15/2022 | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationPope, Randy C Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.