Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Concepcion Bastard, Individually And A N F Of K.B., A Minor, Stephanie Bastard, Individually And A N F Of A.B., A Minor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ryan M. Grant, against Alvarado, Amelia, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Motion (No Fee)
Date: July 19, 2023Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Date: July 21, 2023Jury Trial
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment (Signed) Final Order After Non-Jury Trial Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment Motion (No Fee) Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stephanie Bastard, A.B., Minor and Concepcion Bastard and K.B., Minor's Amended Trial Preparation Amended Filing Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th Jury Trial Notice Notice Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stephanie Bastard, A.B., Minor and Concepcion Bastard and K.B., Minor's Trial Preparation Order No Fee Documents Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Notice Filing Notice Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Proposed Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.