Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Leopard Properties, Ltd., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Sam C. Webb, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th Docket Control Order (MCAD) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Agreed Resolution |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Signed Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mediation**Case Settled** Certificate |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses Designation |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Certificate of Completion of Court Ordered Discovery Certificate of Written Discovery |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Second Mediation Signed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.