Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Donahoo, Amanda, Donahoo, Tracy, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Fox, Michelle Leigh, Hall, Terry Allen, represented by Bert Steinmann, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wonderly, Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWonderly, Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - Conservatorship, Access, Support |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Income Withholding Order
Date: June 28, 2023Agreed Order in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship
Date: June 26, 2023Bench Trial
Date: June 26, 2023Settlement Agreements
Date: June 14, 2023Signed Order
Date: June 13, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: June 06, 2023Proposed Order
Date: June 06, 2023Notice
Date: June 02, 2023(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Intervention
Date: June 05, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 26, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 25, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: May 25, 2023Parenting Certificate
Date: May 25, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: April 25, 2023Signed Order
Date: February 17, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: February 09, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 08, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 08, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: February 08, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: February 07, 2023Response
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: February 01, 2023Signed Order
Date: January 30, 2023No Fee Documents
Date: January 27, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 26, 2023Motion (No Fee)
Date: January 26, 2023Notice
Date: January 25, 2023Settlement Agreements
Date: January 13, 2023Amended Answer
Date: January 12, 2023Affidavit
Date: January 11, 2023Affidavit
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 30, 2022Amended Filing
Date: December 30, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 27, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 27, 2022Notice of Representation
Date: December 27, 2022Notice
Date: December 27, 2022Notice
Date: December 14, 2022Affidavit
Date: December 27, 2022Notice
Date: December 07, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 07, 2022Proposed Order
Date: December 07, 2022Affidavit
Date: December 07, 2022Notice
Date: November 03, 2022Waiver of Service
Date: October 31, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: November 21, 2022Original Answer
Date: October 28, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Letter to Michelle Leigh Fox Income Withholding Order Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Letter to Michelle Leigh Fox Agreed Order in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Wonderly, Scott )
Judge: : Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
DCO PRO SE Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) 06/16/2023Reset by Court to 06/26/202306/26/2023Reset by Court to 06/16/2023 Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Wonderly, Scott )
Judge: : Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) 06/16/2023Reset by Court to 06/16/2023
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement - Final Orders in SAPCR Settlement Agreements Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Signed Order on Petitioner's Motion Permitting Remote Appearance of Respondent Michelle Leigh Fox Signed Order Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Remote Appearance of Respondent Michelle Leigh Fox Motion (No Fee) Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.