Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cc Montgomery 429 Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Sam C. Webb, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Bench Trial
Date: May 08, 2023Agreed Judgment
Date: February 07, 2023Entry
Date: February 03, 2023Notice
Date: December 19, 2022Certificate
Date: December 16, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 31, 2022Answer
Date: October 04, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 15, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment (Signed) Agreed Judgment |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediator's Certification of Completion Certificate |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Docket Control Order |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Mail CitationMontgomery Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/20/2022Returned09/23/2022 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Mail CitationMontgomery Central Appraisal District Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.