Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Conroe Marketplace S C Lp, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Tracy M Turner, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Agreed Resolution |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures No Fee Documents |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement Settlement Agreements |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Certificate of Completion of Court Ordered Discovery Certificate |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order Amended Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.