Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
336 At South Medical Ltd, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Lyndsey Cheek, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Entry
Date: December 02, 2022Agreed Judgment
Date: November 28, 2022Notice
Date: November 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment (Signed) Agreed Judgment |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Docket Control Order |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 - Settlement Agreement Rule 11 |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service - Montgomery Central Appraisal District Return of Service |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationMontgomery Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/20/2022Returned09/22/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.