Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Porterwood Shopping Center Investments, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kenneth R. Cole, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment (Signed) Agreed Judgment |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediator Statement Notice |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Compelling Second Mediation Signed Order |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Plaintiff's FIndings of Fact Proposed Order |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Exhibit List No Fee Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.