Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lexington Apartments, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Greg J. Dalton, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Bench Trial
Date: May 08, 2023Agreed Judgment
Date: March 02, 2023Entry
Date: March 03, 2023Amended Petition
Date: January 09, 2023Notice
Date: January 20, 2023Report
Date: January 19, 2023Signed Order
Date: December 01, 2022Report
Date: November 30, 2022Rule 11
Date: December 06, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 20, 2022Answer
Date: October 04, 2022Request For Service
Date: September 14, 2022E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (MCAD) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry CANCELED Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Agreed Resolution |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment (Signed) Agreed Judgment |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
457th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediator's Report Report |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to Section 42.26 of the Texas Property Tax Code Amended Petition |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 DCO Discovery Extension Rule 11 |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Second Mediation (Signed) Signed Order |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.