Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Urubber, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by William Noe, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Kristin Bays presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin Bays Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Entry
Date: November 17, 2023Certificate
Date: September 13, 2023Bench Trial
Date: September 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Agreed Resolution06/06/2022Reset by Court to 11/14/202211/14/2022Reset by Court to 03/20/202303/20/2023Reset by Court to 09/18/202309/18/2023Reset by Court to 09/27/2023 |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
284th - Entry of Judgment Notification Notice |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mediation Certificate |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Notification Notice |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Exhibit List No Fee Documents |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Joint Filing Notice Amended Filing |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Proposed Order |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses Pursuant to the Docket Control Order Designation |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery Certificate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.