Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tachus Infrastructure, Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Greg C Noschese, Ian N. Shaw, against Cracon Inc. D B A Statewide Services, Statewide Services, Inc., represented by Andrew J. Garceau, Matthew R Maddox, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage - Under $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Jury Trial
Date: December 05, 2022Order of Dismissal
Date: August 11, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed07/18/2022Reset by Court to 12/05/2022 Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Order of Dismissal Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order (12/5/22) Docket Control Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Granting Continuance Order for Continuance Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion for Continuance of Trial and Request for New Docket Control Order Motion for Continuance Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Jury Trial Requested Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Paid
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.