Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blount, Sara, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Simmons, Mason Cole, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship - Conservatorship, Access, Support |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: October 08, 2021Motion to Reinstate
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Nonsuit
Date: June 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Case Disposed |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Nonsuit | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Envelopes Signed Order |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket Order to Reinstate (OCA) |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reinstate Case on Docket Motion to Reinstate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.