Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Apple Ten Hospitality Ownership, Inc, Sunbelt-Csx, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gregory M Hart, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Return of Service
Date: October 21, 2021Answer
Date: November 15, 2021E-Filed Original Petition Document
Date: September 03, 2021Bench Trial
Date: August 15, 2022Agreed Judgment
Date: March 29, 2022Rule 11
Date: January 24, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: November 15, 2021Request For Service
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Case Disposed |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation - Montgomery Central Appraisal District Return of Service |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationMontgomery Central Appraisal DistrictServed10/19/2021Returned10/21/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition E-Filed Original Petition Document |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Form - Montgomery Central Appraisal District Request For Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.