Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Jasmine Necole Cooks, against Riggins, Reid R, represented by C. L. Crawley, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial Debt - Under $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Date: July 18, 2022Bench Trial
Date: July 14, 2022Request
Date: July 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Final Order After Non-Jury Trial Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed07/05/2022Reset by Court to 07/14/2022 Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Granting Request for Virtual Appearance Signed Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Virtual Appearance Request Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List No Fee Documents Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Business Records Affidavit Notice Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance Proposed Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.