Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gafford, Teri, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daragh Jim Carter, against Edwards, Taylor, Hartman, Richard, Hartman, Teena, Rtr Hartman Investments, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage - Over $250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: October 07, 2021Notice of Nonsuit
Date: October 06, 2021Return of Service
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Executed Citation to RTR Hartman Investments, LLC Return of Service Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationRTR Hartman Investments, LLCServed09/28/2021Returned09/29/2021
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationEdwards, Taylor Unserved
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationHartman, TeenaServed09/28/2021Returned09/29/2021
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationHartman, RichardServed09/28/2021Returned09/29/2021
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationHartman, Teena Unserved | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationRTR Hartman Investments, LLC Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.