Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lone Star College System District, Montgomery County, Montgomery County Emergency Services District # 07, Montgomery County Hospital District, New Caney Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alan B Bush, against Arguello, Blas Herrera, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Letters
Date: November 05, 2021Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Date: March 25, 2021Bench Trial
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Re: Payment of Court Costs Letters |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Final Order After Non-Jury Trial Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Nonmilitary Status Affidavit Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Address Certificate Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Notification Notice Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Regarding Payment No Fee Documents Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationArguello, Blas HerreraServed09/14/2020Returned09/17/2020
Judge: Bays, Kristin |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationArguello, Blas Herrera Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.