Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Conroe Independent School District, Lone Star College System District, Montgomery County, Montgomery County Emergency Services District # 07, Montgomery County Hospital District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alan B Bush, against Bevil, Harold H., Chapman, Robin G., Ganchan, Richard P., Giffon, Robert J., Goff, Robert, (total of 12) See All represented by Joshua Jay Benn, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Bays, Kristin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBays, Kristin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Signed Order
Date: September 23, 2022Motion (No Fee)
Date: September 01, 2022Signed Order
Date: January 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Excess Proceeds from the Court's Registry Signed Order |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Excess Proceeds (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bays, Kristin) | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Petition to Withdraw Excess Proceeds from the Court's Registry Motion (No Fee) |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission Notice |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tax - Tax Atty Notice of Excess Proceeds - Alan Bush Finance - Excess Proceeds Notice |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Regarding Order of Sale in Tax Suit Writ - Order of Sale |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ServiceRayburn Development CompanyServed06/01/2022Returned06/28/2022 | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Regarding Order of Sale in Tax Suit Letters |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.