Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sunbelt-Csx, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gregory M Hart, against Montgomery Central Appraisal District, represented by Carol Barton, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Bench Trial
Date: July 19, 2021Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: April 06, 2021Motion for Nonsuit
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Order of Nonsuit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Motion for Nonsuit Motion for Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Scheduling Rule 11 Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Docket Control Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationMontgomery Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/01/2020Returned09/02/2020
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationMontgomery Central Appraisal District Unserved | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Service - Montgomery Central Appraisal District Request For Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.