Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Teas Lakes Property Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bryan Patrick Fowler, against Byford, Alexis, Byford, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Bench Trial
Date: February 01, 2021Abstract of Judgement
Date: November 10, 2020Agreed Judgment
Date: November 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Other Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment CANCELED Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Other Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment - Alexis Abstract of Judgement Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceByford, Alexis Unserved
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ServiceByford, Matthew Unserved
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment - Alexis Request For Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Signed Agreed Judgment Agreed Judgment Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Final Summary Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.