Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Manuel, Marley Love, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manuel, Floyd Rena, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: February 24, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: October 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Case Disposed Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Case Disposed Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Envelopes Docket Control Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Filed Original Petition Document
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.